Financial history 19TH THORNHILL (ITCHEN NORTH DIVISION) - GROUP OF BOY SCOUTS

Charity number: 302310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £17.49k £73.07k £18.96k £21.02k £3.39k
Total expenditure £12.25k £53.04k £8.45k £9.52k £10.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £20.57k N/A