HERTINGFORDBURY RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RECREATION AND SPORT. HOME OF HERTINGFORDBURY CRICKET CLUB
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 20 November 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT STONE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Tony Rhodes | Trustee | 26 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
SARAH PRICE | Trustee | 25 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT PRICE | Trustee | 25 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
TIM BIRCHINALL | Trustee | 25 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
JASON HART | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.97k | £2.26k | £9.79k | £10.67k | £9.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.66k | £7.37k | £7.55k | £5.85k | £6.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 04 May 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 1ST MAY 1956
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A RECREATION GROUND (INCLUDING CHILDRENS PLAYGROUND)
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HERTINGFORDBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
WELL COTTAGE
262 HERTINGFORDBURY ROAD
HERTINGFORDBURY
HERTFORD
SG14 2LG
- Phone:
- 01992587349
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window