Accounts and annual returns PARK STREET VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 302443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 23 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 March 2021 263 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 17 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 17 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window