Financial history PARK STREET VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 302443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £28.54k £30.34k £23.50k £13.91k £27.42k
Total expenditure £23.58k £11.13k £13.52k £60.66k £15.06k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k £18.24k