Trustees PIRTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 302444
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Toni Thomas | Chair | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Webber | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Simmons | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rodney John Marshall | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katie Woodhouse | Trustee | 13 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Robbins | Trustee | 28 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAM WATERS | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.