Financial history SARRATT VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 302464
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £54.51k £57.70k £57.70k £51.27k £59.71k
Total expenditure £39.72k £39.13k £39.13k £54.46k £29.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.44k £5.24k £5.24k N/A £30.80k