Financial history WATERFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 302488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £21.04k £18.91k £21.61k £20.06k £9.29k
Total expenditure £15.59k £11.19k £12.57k £9.76k £12.19k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £300 N/A N/A £10.00k N/A