Trustees 5TH NORTH WATFORD SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 302514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nikhil Vora | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catriona sims | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roxana Buckley | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Brown | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Sally Suiters | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacqui Sexstone | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Green | Trustee | 06 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julie Green | Trustee | 06 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
TANIA GILES | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Sherring | Trustee | 25 May 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.