Financial history 3rd Hoddesdon Scout Group

Charity number: 302548
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £21.80k £14.29k £14.95k £15.50k £18.92k
Total expenditure £19.64k £19.23k £13.89k £10.38k £19.81k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £12.00k £16.10k