Accounts and annual returns 16TH ST ALBANS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 24 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window