Financial history 16TH ST ALBANS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £29.99k £33.66k £30.11k £22.41k £31.53k
Total expenditure £26.65k £30.49k £29.46k £14.33k £22.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £12.13k £8.00k