Trustees 16TH ST ALBANS SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 302575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carolyn Furness | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mike Lancaster | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nilima Willis | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Clarke | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Keigher | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katie Dettmer | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Dundjerovic | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Jane Tinson | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CLARKE | Trustee | 13 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL JOHN WELFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALEX NIKITITS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.