17TH ST ALBANS (ST MICHAEL'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REBECCA METCALFE Trustee 15 August 2013 None on record
Trevor Simpson Trustee 24 January 2020 None on record
RICHARD HEAD Trustee 15 August 2013 None on record
Kirsty Mauldridge Trustee 17 September 2016 None on record
Rob Tanner Trustee 17 September 2016 None on record
Alex Hill Chair 17 September 2016 None on record
Simon Brooke Trustee 25 September 2018 None on record
Andrew Carruthers Trustee 01 June 2013 None on record