1ST STANSTEAD ABBOTTS AND ST MARGARET'S SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 January 2020 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 January 2020 90 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 18 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 July 2017 On time Download