1ST STANSTEAD ABBOTTS AND ST MARGARET'S SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £33.72k £37.42k £28.87k £36.40k £20.37k
Total expenditure £33.93k £34.21k £22.95k £36.58k £10.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £420 N/A N/A £10.00k