1ST STANSTEAD ABBOTTS AND ST MARGARET'S SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NEIL JOHNSON Trustee 27 October 2011 None on record
NICOLA JANE GARDENER Trustee 28 August 2013 None on record
Deborah Gilbert Trustee 20 January 2020 None on record
Helen Sauntson Trustee None on record
Sinead Slater Trustee 20 January 2020 None on record
PAUL ALEXANDER STRETCH Trustee None on record
LUCY ISHAM Trustee 27 October 2011 None on record
CATHERINE MARGARET MOORCROFT Trustee 28 August 2013 None on record
Michael Williamson Trustee 20 January 2020 None on record
MARA HOUGHAM Trustee 07 September 2017 None on record
GAVIN MILES Chair 17 June 2016 None on record
ELAINE ALLES Trustee None on record
MARK WATT Trustee 27 October 2011 None on record
Dr William David Drury Trustee 20 January 2020 None on record