Financial history 9TH NORTH WATFORD (WOODSIDE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £10.95k £9.16k £9.89k £15.08k £15.56k
Total expenditure £8.35k £7.57k £10.96k £6.33k £6.74k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £250 N/A N/A £10.00k £10.63k