WARE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 302624
Charity reporting is up to date (98 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 February 2021 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 February 2021 98 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 20 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 26 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 26 October 2016 On time Download