WARE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 302624
Charity reporting is up to date (98 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £53.82k £61.98k £37.26k £93.62k £37.39k
Total expenditure £55.64k £52.65k £36.07k £86.52k £43.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A