Financial history THE HILTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 302643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023
Total gross income £14.59k £14.91k £23.93k £22.42k £15.89k
Total expenditure £17.50k £13.79k £6.83k £5.31k £13.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £21.33k £17.37k £3.17k