Trustees THE OFFORDS RECREATION HUT, LOCALLY KNOWN AS OFFORD VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 302653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS KATHY MILLWARD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Louise Burmeister | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Scott | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Byam-Cook | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Ruddy | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steve Iddon | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Davis-Marsh | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rod Arnold | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Cutworth | Trustee | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ELLIS | Trustee | 25 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Murby | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA SIMPSON | Trustee | 21 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
HELEN JUDITH BOSWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN KIRBY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.