Accounts and annual returns BIDDENDEN VILLAGE HALLS AND SPORTS COMMITTEE

Charity number: 302684
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 19 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 08 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 05 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window