Financial history BIDDENDEN VILLAGE HALLS AND SPORTS COMMITTEE

Charity number: 302684
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £32.11k £33.40k £60.88k £39.08k £42.94k
Total expenditure £22.22k £25.52k £69.65k £31.29k £29.96k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.60k £25.50k £25.19k £15.55k