BIDDENDEN VILLAGE HALLS AND SPORTS COMMITTEE

Charity number: 302684
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jeanette Oatway Trustee 16 September 2020 None on record
MR JERRY SLINN Trustee None on record
HUGH RICHARDS Trustee 11 January 2017 None on record
Heather Rofina Passmore Trustee 10 June 2018 None on record
Lesley Lidgett Trustee 11 January 2017 None on record
Christopher Charles Friend Trustee 10 June 2018 None on record
MAUREEN FARRIS Trustee
BIDDENDEN CONSOLIDATED CHARITY Received: On time
RICHARD CLIFTON HARRIS Trustee 21 February 2012 None on record
MARY LOU SMITH Trustee None on record
Mark Simon Butterworth Trustee 16 September 2020 None on record
Colin Montagu Rice Trustee 11 January 2017 None on record
MR TOM LUPTON Chair 11 May 2016
THE NYIKA-VWAZA (UK) TRUST Received: On time
ELIZABETH RICKWOOD Trustee None on record
Clive Lewis Thomas Trustee 03 October 2018 None on record