Trustees THE MEMORIAL HALL-FRITTENDEN
Charity number: 302746
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSALIND RILEY | Chair | 23 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Bernard Millard | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Millard | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Diane Pullen | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lester Gosbee | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Bosley | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Dack | Trustee | 10 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Bull | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Highwood | Trustee | 02 February 2011 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Bridges | Trustee | 12 June 2003 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Dunn | Trustee | 22 November 2000 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.