NONINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The hall is used by various local groups as a venue for meetings and activities including badminton, exercise class, Garden and Film Clubs and Parish Council The Hall is also used as a venue for private parties, wedding receptions, funeral teas, children's parties and as a polling station. The hall is used by people of all ages from the village and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 07 September 1964: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRY CLAYTON | Chair | 05 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN PARKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HUGH RONALD NORTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.11k | £21.03k | £7.81k | £6.52k | £7.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.46k | £25.01k | £6.66k | £5.78k | £7.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.00k | £18.79k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30TH JULY 1926
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL AND PLACE OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF NONINGTON CHILLENDEN AND KNOWLTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF NONINGTON CHILLENDEN AND KNOWLTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Albans
Beauchamps Lane
Nonington
Dover
CT15 4EZ
- Phone:
- 01304841588
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window