SHELDWICH VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 302837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Sheldwich Village Hall, and its immediate surroundings, are maintained and administered by the Tustees for the benefit of all in the immediate and surrounding community. Its facilitates the use of the hall by groups from local clubs, other organisations and individuals. These activities include, Meetings, Talks, Fitness Classes and Social Events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £8,161
Total expenditure: £7,160

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 December 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM HENRY HARBOUR Chair
None on record
Janet Martin Trustee 22 April 2021
None on record
HELEN WHITE Trustee 12 June 2012
None on record
DEIRDRE DAY Trustee 12 June 2012
None on record
SUSAN MORGAN-KIRBY Trustee
None on record
ROSEMARY NICOLA WHITE Trustee
None on record
JOHN NIMMO Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.98k £631 £6.43k £7.83k £8.16k
Total expenditure £5.19k £9.70k £8.24k £6.00k £7.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
STATUTORY DECLARATION DATED 17 SEPTEMBER 1968
Charitable objects
THE ACQUISTION OF LAND AND ERECTION OF A NEW VILLAGE HALL AND THE EXPENSES THEREOF; AND ALSO FOR THE CURRENT ADMINISTRATION OF THE VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
SHELDWICH
Registration history
  • 22 December 1968 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Sheldwich Village Hall
Lees Court Road
Sheldwich Lees
Faversham
ME13 0NG
Phone:
01795536467
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available