Financial history THE ELIZA MARTYR CHILDREN'S PLAYGROUND AND COMMUNAL OPEN SPACE

Charity number: 302851
Charity reporting is overdue by 144 days

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A