WYE VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND CHARITY

Charity number: 302899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rugth Judge Trustee 01 February 2018
WYE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY Received: On time
Hagan White Trustee 24 May 2017 None on record
RICHARD BLACKFORD Trustee 22 November 2011 None on record
Fiona Miller Trustee 26 November 2020 None on record
DR TERRY DONOVAN Trustee
WYE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY Received: On time
Joanna RALL Chair 22 November 2011 None on record
PAMELA DONOVAN Trustee 22 January 2020
THE ASSOCIATION OF THE FRIENDS OF ST. GREGORY AND ST. MARTIN AT WYE Received: On time
Diane Reece Trustee 23 April 2014 None on record
John Mansfield Trustee 01 March 2018 None on record
Russell Cook Trustee 22 July 2020 None on record
Mary Stewart Trustee 23 April 2014 None on record
Penny Haynes Trustee 24 May 2017 None on record