BEXLEY BOYS AND GIRLS HALL- IN MEMORY

Charity number: 302926
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
  • Bexley
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 August 1962: Standard registration
  • 03 March 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • BEXLEY BOYS AND GIRLS MEMORIAL HALL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 08 December 2005 38 days late