Accounts and annual returns 6TH HILLINGDON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302936
Charity reporting is overdue by 1493 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 397 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 397 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 762 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 762 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1127 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1127 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1493 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1493 days