Financial history 6TH HILLINGDON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302936
Charity reporting is overdue by 1485 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £13.61k £14.74k £15.37k £17.17k £15.21k
Total expenditure £9.30k £11.82k £23.25k £17.73k £17.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.29k £0