BROMLEY AND DOWNHAM BOYS' CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bromley and Downham Youth Club provides a safe, secure environment for young people of the area. The building has a Sports Hall for football, basketball, dance, keep fit and gymnastics. Separate Boxing Gym with an active Boxing Club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bromley
- Lewisham
Governance
- 31 August 1967: Standard registration
- BROMLEY AND DOWNHAM YOUTH CLUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Cheverton | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Paul Michael Foster | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
MARK CHRISTOPHER MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Hilary Cheverton | Trustee |
|
||||||||
PETER LEONARD WILTON MORGAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £136.44k | £21.14k | £36.92k | £45.38k | £47.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.41k | £45.02k | £41.09k | £38.34k | £58.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH DECEMBER 1933. CONSTITUTION DATED 19TH SEPTEMBER 1949
Charitable objects
FOR THE DEVELOPMENT AND RUNNING OF BOYS'S CLUBS
Area of benefit
BROMLEY, KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bromley & Downham Youth & Community Centre
41 Valeswood Road
BROMLEY
BR1 4RD
- Phone:
- 02084612597
- Email:
- info@banddyc.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window