Trustees SIR PHILIP GAME BOYS' CLUB

Charity number: 302980
Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Terrence Gillam Chair 09 March 2015
None on record
Leon Anthony Spence Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record
Sally Thorpe Trustee 16 July 2015
None on record
Kylie Jane Griffiths Trustee 30 March 2015
None on record
Yahya El-Droubie Trustee 05 November 2002
None on record
FAYE Constance RUDDOCK Trustee
None on record