ELEANOR SHORTER FOR PLAYING FIELDS AND RECREATION GROUNDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The maintenance and improvement of Haling Grove Park, and the provision of additional facilities and equipment for play and recreation within the London Borough of Croydon
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Croydon
- Surrey
Governance
- 06 September 1961: Standard registration
- ELEANOR SHORTER FUND (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWARD GORDON HANDLEY MBE JP | Chair | 15 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Nina Robbins | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
CLAUDIE DANIELE ALICE MORTREUIL | Trustee | 17 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHEETHAM | Trustee |
|
||||||
COUNCILLOR MRS LYNNE CAROL HALE JP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.32k | £5.80k | £5.55k | £7.16k | £7.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.64k | £0 | £0 | £16.22k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 December 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2024 | 213 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 June 2023 | 227 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 March 2022 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 March 2021 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 14 FEBRUARY 1934.
Charitable objects
PLAYING FIELDS OR RECREATION GROUNDS
Area of benefit
COUNTY BOROUGH OF CROYDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fields in Trust, Unit 2/D
Woodstock Studios
36 Woodstock Grove
LONDON
W12 8LE
- Phone:
- 02074272113
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window