THE HOLISTIC TRUST FOR ANIMALS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting or conducting research in the science of natural and holistic medicine, its practice and efficacy and, in particular, its use in the treament of animals in need of care and attention.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 January 1998: Standard registration
- 06 June 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE HOLISTIC TRUST FOR ANIMALS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13 | £30 | £35 | £21 | £106 | |
|
Total expenditure | £113 | £117 | £113 | £113 | £6.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF ARTICLES AND ASSOCIATIONS INCORPORATED ON 31 DECEMBER 1997.
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE AND PROMOTE OR CONDUCT RESEARCH IN THE OF NATURAL AND HOLISTIC MEDICINE, ITS PRACTICE AND EFFICACY AND, IN PARTICULAR, ITS USE IN THE TREATMENT OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window