FARNBOROUGH NOT FORGOTTEN CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of sickness, poverty and distress of the elderly and the young who are in need by reason of the above.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 29 June 1998: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RACHEL DUNSMORE | Chair | 28 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES BEAVEN | Trustee | 22 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
RUTH BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.98k | £4.55k | £2.82k | £3.90k | £9.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.70k | £10.09k | £5.89k | £9.70k | £10.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 March 2021 | 269 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 APRIL 1998.
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND POVERTY AND DISTRESS OF THE ELDERLY AND THE YOUNG WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THE ABOVE. 2) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 OAKLEA
ASH VALE
ALDERSHOT
GU12 5HP
- Phone:
- 01252327921
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
wwww.notforgot.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window