TAVISTOCK ROUND TABLE 661 AREA 19

Charity number: 1064437
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)