Financial history SOUTH RUISLIP COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 303088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £35.51k £38.66k £38.66k £41.15k £40.20k
Total expenditure £40.57k £36.40k £36.40k £23.54k £8.86k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k