Financial history ST CLEMENT'S TRUST FUND

Charity number: 303128
Charity reporting is overdue by 1210 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £9.75k £3.75k £1.95k £1.50k £1.28k
Total expenditure £9.68k £3.70k £1.90k £1.57k £1.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A