The Graham Spicer Institute

Charity number: 303129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 24 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 24 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 19 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 19 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 09 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 22 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 22 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 11 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 11 December 2016 On time Download