Financial history WIMBLEDON AND PUTNEY COMMONS CONSERVATORS

Charity number: 303167
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.60m £1.76m £1.74m £1.87m £1.87m
Total expenditure £2.08m £1.92m £1.94m £2.16m £2.46m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A £13.28k £13.28k
Income from government grants £12.78k N/A N/A £13.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £23.24k £116.82k £90.94k £98.14k £105.57k
Income - Other trading activities £401.88k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.12m £1.61m £1.62m £1.73m £1.72m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £39.33k £35.69k £36.99k £49.54k £47.85k
Income - Other £9.82k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.08m £1.92m £1.94m £2.16m £2.46m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £572.20k £148.22k £53.93k £41.94k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £211.16k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0