ARBOUR YOUTH CENTRE
Charity number: 303238
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROVISION OF YOUTH ACTIVITIES WITHIN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. DUNSTAN AND ALL SAINTS, STEPNEY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
Registration history:
- 24 October 1966: Standard registration
- 02 March 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.16k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 February 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 12 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 12 December 2019 | 315 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 18TH JULY 1967 AS VARIED BY DEED
Charitable objects
YOUTH CENTRE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. DUNSTAN AND ALL SAINTS, STEPNEY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window