Financial history CHURCHILL GARDENS TENANTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 303294
Charity reporting is overdue by 140 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £74.30k £32.90k £63.30k £39.77k £80.01k
Total expenditure £76.84k £29.38k £66.33k £39.91k £69.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.65k £35.48k £6.75k £25.13k