LONDON SCHOOLS' CRICKET ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 303325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 November 2019 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 November 2019 8 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 January 2019 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 08 January 2019 69 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 28 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 October 2016 On time Download