LONDON SCHOOLS' CRICKET ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 303325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £173.05k £172.06k £226.12k £42.89k £113.73k
Total expenditure £160.60k £169.97k £245.31k £33.45k £104.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A