Accounts and annual returns Lighthouse Christian Books and Cafe

Charity number: 1063294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 November 2019 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 07 November 2019 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 03 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 24 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window