1ST ST NEOTS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 29 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 30 October 2016 On time Download