1ST ST NEOTS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 303347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £79.12k £42.41k £27.03k £31.44k £24.44k
Total expenditure £116.63k £47.62k £32.25k £33.31k £14.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A