Trustees PUBLOW AND PENSFORD MEMORIAL PLAYING FIELD AND VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1065797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sheila Wilcox Trustee 02 February 2016
None on record
Jennifer Elizabeth Ann Gully Trustee 13 October 2015
None on record
Lisbeth Taylerson Trustee 14 July 2015
None on record
Charles Roger Stephenson Trustee 07 April 2015
None on record
Alan Burbridge Trustee 02 December 2014
None on record
Linda Quinn Trustee 02 December 2014
None on record